MA S2093 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2110
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Rules, to whom was referred the Senate Bill to prohibit the use of mobile telephones while operating a motor vehicle (Senate, No. 2032),-- reports that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2093).
Title
To prohibit the use of mobile telephones while operating a motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2110 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Substituted as amended for S2032 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #23 (Montigny) adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Barrett) adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Barrett) rejected - Roll Call #225 [YEAS 5 - NAYS 31] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Barrett) rejected - Roll Call #224 [YEAS 12 - NAYS 24] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call #223 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #24 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #222 [YEAS 8 - NAYS 28] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #22 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Donoghue) rejected |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #20 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call #221 [YEAS 25 - NAYS 11] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #220 [YEAS 13 - NAYS 23] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #17 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #219 [YEAS 12 - NAYS 24] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Tarr) adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #218 [YEAS 12 - NAYS 24] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Jehlen) adopted - Roll Call #217 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0] |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Moore) adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Timilty) adopted - Roll Call #216 [YEAS 33 - NAYS 3] |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 21, 2016 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2032 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Rule |
Same As/Similar To
S2110 (Replaces) 2016-01-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1858 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2032
S536 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
S830 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S493 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2032 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2093
S460 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2108
S454 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2308
S1759 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
H2737 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1970
H2562 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1858 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2032
S536 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
S830 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S493 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2032 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2093
S460 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2108
S454 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2308
S1759 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
H2737 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1970
H2562 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2093 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2093.pdf |