MA S2084 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to street rods and custom vehicles. Transportation.
Title
Relative to street rods and custom vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2560 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2560 |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1112 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2084 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2084.pdf |