MA S2068 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to zero-based budgeting and budget transparency. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to zero-based budgeting and budget transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Monday July 1, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H2341 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
H3566 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4593

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback