MA S2063 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 26 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 26 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-26 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, Monday, November 14, 2011 – New draft of Senate, No. 2042 reported from the
Title
Providing for annual caterer’s licenses for the service of alcoholic beverages at private functions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-26 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-25 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2012-07-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-07-24 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-24 | House | Amendment rejected |
2012-07-24 | House | Amendment rejected |
2012-07-24 | House | Read third |
2012-07-11 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-07-09 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-07-09 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of an amendment, H4245 |
2011-11-15 | House | Referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2042 |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2042 |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2063 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17611&generalCourtId=1 |