MA S2061 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote equality and respect in the legislature. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Promoting equality and respect in the legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 12:00 PM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2358 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2651
S1691 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1713 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
S1691 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1713 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2061 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2061.pdf |