MA S206 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2567

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the citizenship requirement to be appointed manger on license for the sale of alcoholic beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the citizenship requirement to be appointed manger on license for the sale of alcoholic beverages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-26SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2567
2023-05-10JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2567 (Replaced by) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback