MA S2056 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure transportation sector cost savings through joint procurement. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure transportation sector cost savings through joint procurement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-22SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2023-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2019 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3097 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3116 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3068 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H3074 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback