MA S2055 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2192
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to gender identity on Massachusetts identification. Transportation.
Title
Relative to gender identity on Massachusetts identification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2192 |
2019-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S437 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S877 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1342 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2192 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S437 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S877 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1342 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2192 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2055 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2055.pdf |