MA S205 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to small businesses and the sale of certain cultural products. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to small businesses and the sale of certain cultural products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-01SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-02-01JointHearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2024-01-31JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2024-01-30JointHearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2023-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/24/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2497 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S2757 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2820 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback