MA S2047 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit taxpayer-funded nondisclosure agreements. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Prohibiting taxpayer-funded nondisclosure agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2764 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2737 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2945 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1217 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1837 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1256 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S681 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1020 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1887 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2764 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2737 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2945 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1217 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1837 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1256 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S681 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1020 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H1887 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2047 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2047.pdf |