MA S2036 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a behavioral science insights policy directive. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to government efficiency
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2076 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2043 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2052 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2103 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S60 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2688
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2043 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2052 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S1840 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S2103 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2036 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2036.pdf |