MA S2010 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2681
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to change the flag of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To change the flag of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2681 |
2021-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2681 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H55 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H89
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2681 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H55 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H89
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2010 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2010.pdf |