MA S1966 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4675

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to clarify lobbying law violations. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying lobbying law violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4675
2023-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H4287 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Senate concurred
H4507 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2730 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2831
S2743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4675 (Replaced by) 2024-07-08 - Reported, in part, by H3107
S2831 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback