MA S1958 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to transition Massachusetts to 100 per cent renewable energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transitioning Massachusetts to 100 per cent renewable energy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateReporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-17JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1940 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
S520 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2155 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1979 (Similar To) 2020-01-07 - Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1993 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2001 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
S2003 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S435 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1945 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2836 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-01-17 - Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback