MA S1924 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to combat climate change. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To combat climate change

Sponsors

Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Sen. William Brownsberger [D]
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Sen. James Welch [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Sen. Edward Kennedy [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]
Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-13SenateReporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-01-07JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S433 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H749 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1663 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S79 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1602 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3846 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
H3987 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback