MA S1892 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts student relief and retention tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts student relief and retention tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3865 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4541
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S313 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1852 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1918 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H611 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S321 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2751
S289 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
S329 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S313 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
H540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S333 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1852 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S821 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2746
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1918 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1892 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1892.pdf |