MA S1890 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designate a certain bridge in the towns of Erving and Orange as the Franklin County purple heart memorial bridge
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the towns of Orange and Wendell as the Franklin County Purple Heart Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-02-16 | Enacted | |
2010-02-11 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-27 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-12-30 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-12-28 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-12-28 | Rules suspended | |
2009-12-28 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2009-10-19 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ethics and Rules | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S1890 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=1066&generalCourtId=2 |