MA S1868 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H2797
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H2797
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to recognition of the "Honor and Remember" flag in the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to recognition of the "Honor and Remember" flag in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | House | Accompanied H2797 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2161 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S1588 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied H2380
S2171 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2380 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2313 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2797 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1588 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied H2380
S2171 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2380 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2313 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2797 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1868 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1868.pdf |