MA S1863 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to tiny homes. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to tiny homes
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Rep. John Lawn [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Accompanied by H2031 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2721 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1208 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2044 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1383 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H740 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H2031 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1863
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2721 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1208 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2044 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1383 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H421 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H740 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H2031 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1863
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1863 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1863.pdf |