MA S1814 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to public accessibility requirements. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to public accessibility requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-10-28JointHearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

H1113 (Similar To) 2019-08-27 - Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1756 (Similar To) 2019-10-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - House concurred
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1976 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - House concurred
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2211 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
H4045 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2339 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback