MA S1800 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2569
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Garden of Peace. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the Garden of Peace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2569 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1655 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1293 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S333 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2347 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3582 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5106
H2003 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1655 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1293 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S333 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2347 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3582 (Similar To) 2020-11-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H5106
H2003 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1800 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1800.pdf |