MA S1780 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to transportation and housing policy programs. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Transportation and Housing Provider and Member Policy Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4481 |
2017-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1741 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S260 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1940 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1994 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
S1776 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1967 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2193
S1948 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2410 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 423 of the Acts of 2018
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S260 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1940 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1994 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
S1776 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1967 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2193
S1948 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H1903 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3819 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S2410 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 423 of the Acts of 2018
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1780 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1780.pdf |