MA S1774 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4624

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the surplus from a tax title sale. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the surplus from a tax title sale

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4624
2024-03-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/22/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S644 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636
H2983 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4675
H4624 (Replaced by) 2024-06-26 - New draft substituted, see H4791

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback