MA S1770 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint State Administration and Regulatory Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


For legislation to require fiscal responsibility. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Requiring fiscal responsibility



2017-10-19JointHearing scheduled for 10/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S187 (Similar To) 2017-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 428
S723 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2131
H2831 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3000 (Similar To) 2017-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Westfield State University
H1011 (Similar To) 2017-05-17 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H1665 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources

Bill Comments