MA S1740 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish February 20 as Frederick Douglass Day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To establish February 20 as Frederick Douglass Day
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Montigny [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1767 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H64 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H60 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
H1697 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2017
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H57 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3828 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2480 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - See S2372
H64 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - No further action
H60 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Placed on file
H1697 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2017
S1 (Similar To) 2017-01-24 - Placed on file
H57 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3828 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2480 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - See S2372
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1740 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1740.pdf |