MA S1702 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to pension parity. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pension parity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-21JointHearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H3757 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3758 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3759 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2639 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1703 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4105 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1706 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2686 (Similar To) 2021-09-21 - Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1737 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2635 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback