MA S1694 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to regional transportation ballot initiatives. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to regional transportation ballot initiatives

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 16, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H1655 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1293 (Similar To) 2019-08-12 - House concurred
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S333 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2347 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2653 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H2003 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback