MA S1645 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2549
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to mitigate water resource impacts. Revenue.
Title
Mitigating water resource impacts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2549 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1853 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1351 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S1171 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73
H2134 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H3625 (Similar To) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4893
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1351 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S1171 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Amended by substitution of a resolve with the same title, H73
H2134 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H3625 (Similar To) 2020-07-27 - New draft substituted, see H4893
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1645 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1645.pdf |