MA S1644 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2610

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to pensions, fiduciary standards, and sustainable investment. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pensions, fiduciary standards, and sustainable investment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-08SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2610
2023-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1729 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H2580 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S2610 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Reported (in part) by S1614
S2611 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2769 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback