MA S1643 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2549
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to tax abatements for deaf residents. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax abatements for deaf residents
Sponsors
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] |
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2549 |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2540 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2600 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2602 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2482 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1531 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H216 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2600 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2602 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2482 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1531 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H216 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1643 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1643.pdf |