MA S1636 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to health education in women's correctional institutions. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to health education in women's correctional institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H1637 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S634 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H1715 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H1637 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1410 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S634 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1063 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
H1715 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1636 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1636.pdf |