MA S1625 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to study technology to monitor and protect individuals in law enforcement custody. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission to study technology to monitor and protect individuals in law enforcement custody
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday May 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 5, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2311 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
S1777 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H887 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2640 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H2456 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1777 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H887 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2640 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H2456 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1625 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1625.pdf |