MA S1595 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to permit familial searching and partial DNA matches in investigating certain unsolved crimes. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Permitting familial searching and partial DNA matches in investigating certain unsolved crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday May 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 5, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3866 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1650 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1551 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S965 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
H1512 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1096 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S959 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1562 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1650 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S576 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1551 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S965 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2671
H1512 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1096 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S959 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1130 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1562 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1595 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1595.pdf |