MA S1576 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. O'Connor, a petition of Patrick M. O'Connor and Steven George Xiarhos that provisions be made for an investigation and study by a special commission to study the Commonwealth’s response to and resources for victims of domestic violence and sexual assault. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve establishing a commission to study the Commonwealth’s response to and resources for victims of domestic violence and sexual assault

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30SenateResolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-04-25HouseHouse concurred
2024-04-16SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-04HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-25SenateReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-09-06JointHearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2023-09-06JointHearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1096 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S1099 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
S2477 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2479 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback