MA S1565 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide survivor benefits to Ava Roy, the daughter of fallen firefighter Christopher Roy. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing survivor benefits to Ava Roy, the daughter of fallen firefighter Christopher Roy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-14SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-06HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 22, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2276 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3206 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback