MA S1548 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a correctional inspector general office. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing a correctional inspector general office
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D] | Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. John Cronin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1604 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
S1481 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H2422 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H3038 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1481 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H2422 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
H3038 (Similar To) 2023-09-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1548 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1548.pdf |