MA S1546 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts correctional officer accountability and standards training Commission. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts correctional officer accountability and standards training Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4562 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1546 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1546.pdf |