MA S1505 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2497

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the "circuit breaker" property tax credit for seniors. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the "circuit breaker" property tax credit for seniors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2497
2017-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1546 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2497 (Replaced by) 2018-07-25 - Reported (in part) by S1507

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback