MA S1504 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the retroactive application of veterans creditable service. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the retroactive application of veterans creditable service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-04SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-10-11JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2395 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2398 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2401 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2161 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Senate concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H2386 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-05-14 - Senate concurred
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback