MA S1487 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-14 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the cost of living adjustment for state and teacher retirees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the cost of living adjustment for state and teacher retirees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-14SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-21HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday April 22, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2232 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1578 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2326 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1523 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2321
S1533 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2203 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2158 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1503 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2346
S1536 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback