MA S1469 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to a service based retirement option for Group 1 and Group 2 career employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a service based retirement option for Group 1 and Group 2 career employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2268 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
H2316 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2371 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1593 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2386 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2196 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2197 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4158 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Hearing scheduled for 01/29/2020 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback