MA S1465 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2491
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to veterans creditable service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to veterans creditable service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2491 |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1397 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2014 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2018
S1924 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S2013 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S1429 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1460 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1454 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1428 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1415 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4519 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2014 (Similar To) 2018-03-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 54 of the Acts of 2018
S1924 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S2013 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2420
S1429 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1460 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1454 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1428 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1331 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1415 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2547 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3298 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4519 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1465 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1465.pdf |