MA S1460 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-31 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-31 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Conservation and Recreation and the city of Worcester to create and operate a multi purpose rectangular field at the Lake Avenue Park in Worcester. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Department of Conservation and Recreation and the city of Worcester to create and operate a multi purpose rectangular field at the Lake Avenue Park in Worcester
Sponsors
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. John Fresolo [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Read second (amended as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1460 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1460.pdf |