MA S1448 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2685

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2685
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to monitor dry casks of spent nuclear fuel. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to monitoring dry casks of spent nuclear fuel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-11SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2685
2023-09-25JointHearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2685 (Replaced by) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4635 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Adopted, in concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback