MA S1442 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3795
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H3795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Accompanied H3795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the health and well-being of mothers and infants. Public Health.
Title
Promoting the health and well-being of mothers and infants
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | House | Accompanied H3795 |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S241 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H327 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H3795 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H327 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H3795 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1442 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1442.pdf |