MA S1411 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to enhance child passenger safety. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enhance child passenger safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-11-01JointHearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-16JointHearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H2957 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H821 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4229
S519 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - House concurred
S2098 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - House concurred
S2121 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - House concurred
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
S2433 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback