MA S1385 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a moratorium on face recognition and other remote biometric surveillance systems. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a moratorium on face recognition and other remote biometric surveillance systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-10SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-08-08HouseHouse concurred
2019-08-05SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S522 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1429 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
H1538 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Senate concurred
H1482 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback