MA S1377 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2565
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce recidivism and promote family relationships during incarceration. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To reduce recidivism and promote family relationships during incarceration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2565 |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1412 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H3343 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2127 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3380 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3609 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3343 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2127 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3380 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3609 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1377 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1377.pdf |