MA S1355 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to licensing vertical reciprocating conveyors. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to licensing vertical reciprocating conveyors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-07-19JointHearing rescheduled to 07/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2017-07-06JointHearing scheduled for 07/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S593 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1166 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1928 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2457
S1324 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S135 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2191 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S1045 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1053 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H140 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1319 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2815 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4648
H1265 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H477 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback