MA S1355 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2111

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide incentives for the purchase and use of alternative fuel vehicles. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing incentives for the purchase and use of alternative fuel vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-24SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2111
2013-04-29JointHearing scheduled for 04/02/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
2013-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2013-01-22SenateReferred to the Senate Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2111 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback